Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists to place a licensee on inactive status for not more than 2 years under certain circumstances; requiring the Board to provide a certain licensee with written notification of certain information; prohibiting a licensee on inactive status from practicing audiology, hearing aid dispensing, or speech-language pathology; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Text - Chapter - State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page