Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Board of Elections)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain provision of law requiring a campaign finance entity to terminate and file a final campaign finance report applies; altering the time period within which a certain campaign finance entity is required to terminate and file a final campaign finance report; and requiring the State Board of Elections, not later than 6 months before a campaign finance entity is required to terminate, to provide a certain notification to the responsible persons affiliated with the campaign finance entity.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105169/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {105169/1 Adopted 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59A
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM