Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices and Accessories - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Guzzone (Chair, Special Joint Commission on Public Safety and Security in State and Local Correctional Facilities) and Delegate Cluster
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from attempting to deliver or possessing with the intent to deliver specified telecommunication devices or accessories to a person detained or confined in a specified place of confinement; prohibiting a person from depositing or concealing specified telecommunication devices or accessories in or about a place of confinement; prohibiting a person detained or confined in a place of confinement from knowingly possessing or receiving specified telecommunication devices or accessories; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0206
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {272313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Delegate Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {272313/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Special Order until 2/25 (Delegate Guzzone) Adopted 30
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 36
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM