Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pub Saf & Scrty In St & Local Crrctnl Facs, Ch, Sp Jt Comm

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 /CH0145 (SB0206/CH0144)
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices and Accessories - Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0143 (SB0205/CH0142)
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Facilities - Officers and Inspection Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0142 (HB0176/CH0143)
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Facilities - Officers and Inspection Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0144 (HB0175/CH0145)
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices and Accessories - Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 /CH0145 (SB0206/CH0144) Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices and Accessories - Penalty By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0176 /CH0143 (SB0205/CH0142) Correctional Services - Correctional Facilities - Officers and Inspection Standards By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0205 /CH0142 (HB0176/CH0143) Correctional Services - Correctional Facilities - Officers and Inspection Standards By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0144 (HB0175/CH0145) Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices and Accessories - Penalty By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM