Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the termination date applicable to the Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit to June 30, 2022; and extending the applicability of the credit to taxable years beginning before January 1, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {175161/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Moon) Rejected 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 62
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text - Chapter - Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2000, 2005, 2010 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM