Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commerce, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0084
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 /CH0085
Title
Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0082
Title
Distressed Counties - References and Definitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0083
Title
Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0084 Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0175 /CH0085 Maryland Research and Development Tax Credit - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 /CH0082 Distressed Counties - References and Definitions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 /CH0083 Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM