Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in Frederick County a barbershop beer and wine license; requiring a recipient of the license to be a holder of a barbershop permit; authorizing a holder of the license to provide no more than 5 ounces of beer or wine by the glass for on-premises consumption by a customer when a barbering service is provided or a specified fund-raising event is held; prohibiting the license from being transferred to another location; specifying the hours that the license privilege may be exercised; specifying an annual license fee of $100; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001.2, 20-102 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:31 AM