Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue electronic credentials in addition to, and not instead of, a license or an identification card; defining an "electronic credential" as an electronic representation of a license, an identification card, or a data field; establishing that a credential holder satisfies certain license display requirements; authorizing the Administration to create an electronic credential; authorizing an alcoholic beverages license holder to accept an electronic credential as proof of age; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {860410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {860410/1 Adopted 38
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-116, 11-128, 16-1001 through 16-1005, 16-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM