Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 /CH0141
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0142
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0138
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0139
Title
Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0140
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 /CH0141 Maryland Transportation Authority Facilities - Video Tolls - Collection By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 /CH0142 Motor Vehicle Administration - Licenses and Identification Cards - Electronic Credentials By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0376 Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019) By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0138 Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses - Expiration and Renewal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0139 Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 /CH0140 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM