Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Afzali, Barve, Brooks, Healey, Hixson, Impallaria, Jameson, Lafferty, Lam, McDonough, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Stein, West, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing up to five hospitals in the State to participate in a substance use treatment demonstration program; providing that the purpose of the demonstration program is to identify best practices to identify patients potentially in need of treatment, screen patients, and refer patients in need of substance use treatment to specified services; requiring each participating hospital to operate an inpatient and outpatient substance use treatment program or ensure that specified treatment services are made available; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0908 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-310.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM