Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from specified procurement law expenditures made by the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System for the safe custody of investments of the State Retirement and Pension System; transferring the authority to arrange for the safe custody of investments from the State Treasurer to the Board of Trustees; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement Agency - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714361/1 Adopted 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 26
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM