Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Afzali, Ghrist, Metzgar, Rose, Shoemaker, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the Maryland Accessibility Code applies to new construction, a renovation, a reconstruction of an existing building, and a specified change of use; and defining a term.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0852
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Accessibility Code - Applicability
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM