Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lam, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Krimm, Lierman, Miele, and Moon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a driver of a motor vehicle that passes a bicycle, an EPAMD, or a motor scooter at a distance of less than 3 feet in accordance with a specified provision of law to slow to a reasonable and prudent speed that is safe for existing weather, road, and vehicular or pedestrian traffic conditions and does not endanger, impede, or interfere with the bicycle, EPAMD, motor scooter or other traffic; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1123
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {430614/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-24)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {430614/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (114-24) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM