Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the county boards of education receive a specified grant to reflect regional differences in the cost of education that are due to factors outside of the control of the local jurisdiction; and repealing a provision that allowed for the reduction of a grant under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0183
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0114 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM