Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Governor's Salary Commission)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the annual salaries of the Comptroller, Treasurer, Attorney General, and Secretary of State; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0236
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 4:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/17/2014 Text - First - Constitutional Officers - Salaries
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-103, 5-104, 6-103, 7-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM