Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Governor's Salary Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 (SB0236/CH0283)
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0235/CH0477)
Title
Governor - Pension and Health Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 /JR0002 (SJ0003/JR0001)
Title
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 /CH0477 (HB0231)
Title
Governor - Pension and Health Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0283 (HB0230)
Title
Constitutional Officers - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 /JR0001 (HJ0003/JR0002)
Title
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 (SB0236/CH0283) Constitutional Officers - Salaries By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 (SB0235/CH0477) Governor - Pension and Health Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 /JR0002 (SJ0003/JR0001) Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 2
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 /CH0477 (HB0231) Governor - Pension and Health Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB0236 /CH0283 (HB0230) Constitutional Officers - Salaries By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 /JR0001 (HJ0003/JR0002) Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM