Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Reduction in Financial Aid - Notification
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Barve, Brooks, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, S. Howard, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, McDonough, Miele, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring institutions of higher education who reduce institutional financial aid awarded to specified students to notify specified financial aid providers of the reduction.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM