Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Smith, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a manufacturer or distributor to be licensed as a vehicle dealer if the manufacturer or distributor deals only in electric or nonfossil-fuel burning vehicles, no dealer in the State holds a franchise from the manufacturer or distributor, and the manufacturer or distributor does not have a specified relationship with another manufacturer or distributor licensed as a dealer under the Act; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations to implement the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {770116/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898179/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {123323/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {123323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {113122/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-15)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {770116/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {898179/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {123323/1 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {123323/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {113122/1 Withdrawn 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 67
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (122-15) 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-302, 15-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM