Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Afzali, Bates, Beitzel, Cluster, Dwyer, Fisher, Frank, George, Glass, Gutierrez, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Hough, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Norman, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a question that relates to the enactment of a legislative or congressional districting plan that was petitioned to referendum include a map of the State that shows the boundary lines for the legislative or congressional districts that are included in the legislative or congressional districting plan.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM