Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Workers' Compensation Children's Scholarship Fund; requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission to impose, in addition to payment of specified compensation, a $5000 assessment against an employer or its insurer per award of compensation; providing that assessments under the Act shall be paid to the Fund; authorizing the Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight to award specified scholarship assistance to individuals who meet specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401 through 10-403, 9-751 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM