Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting community college trustees and employees from engaging in any unfair labor practice; and providing that the Act does not apply to certain activities or expenses incurred under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {343828/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-87)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-47)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 30
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Floor Amendment {343828/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-87) 31
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (83-47) 33
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Finance 34
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM