Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Morgan State University - Board of Regents - Length and Limitation of Terms and Residency Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, Anderson, Branch, Carter, Conaway, Glenn, Haynes, Mitchell, B. Robinson, Stukes, and Tarrant
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the length of time of the term of office of a member of the Board of Regents of Morgan State University; setting a limit on the number of terms that a member may serve; and limiting the number of specified members who are not residents of Maryland.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0226
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814964/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994239/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {814964/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 31
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {994239/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 63
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM