Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Atterbeary, Barkley, Brooks, Ebersole, Hill, Hixson, Jalisi, Lam, Pendergrass, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for a maximum fine of $500 for a violation of specified prohibitions against using a handheld telephone while driving a motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0212 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1124.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM