Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Bagnall, Charles, Cullison, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, and Saab
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a distribution from a perpetual care trust fund made under certain circumstances to be used only for the perpetual care of the cemetery, including the maintenance of the grounds, roads, and paths and the repair and renewal of buildings; permitting a certain cemetery to select a certain method of distribution from a certain trust fund; requiring the trustee to distribute a certain income from the perpetual care trust fund if the cemetery does not select a method of distribution from the perpetual care trust fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 1:05 PM