Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a health care practitioner involved in the delivery or care of a substance-exposed newborn to make a report to a local department of social services except under specified circumstances; establishing that a report made under the Act does not create a specified presumption; requiring the Department of Human Resources to submit a preliminary report to the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2014, and a final report on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {812619/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {123726/3
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-88)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {223424/1 Rejected (45-87)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {812619/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {123726/3 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-88) 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {223424/1 Rejected (45-87) 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM