Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0090
Title
Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0022
Title
Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0245 /CH0090 Family Law - Substance-Exposed Newborns By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0022 Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of Assistance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM