Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "stinger-steered automobile transporter" to include certain vehicles not engaged exclusively in the transportation of automobiles or boats for purposes of certain provisions of law regulating vehicle length and loads; specifying that certain provisions of law regulating vehicle length and loads do not prohibit a backhaul by an automobile transporter; increasing the maximum allowable length of a certain stinger-steered automobile transporter; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
(   24-104.1, 24-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page