Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2019, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Program; authorizing the Program to disclose specified information to specified persons under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a direct full evaluation of the Program on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0296
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566284/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {566284/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07, 21-2A-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM