Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the Maryland Horse Industry Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2026, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2023; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220017/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {220017/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 31
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-719, 6-107.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM