Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights to include a review of certain data and recommendations, if any, for policy changes to address discriminatory trends noted in the data in its annual report; requiring certain county offices of civil rights to report certain information relating to complaints of employment discrimination to the Commission; making the reporting requirement applicable only in Anne Arundel County, Baltimore City, Baltimore County, Howard County, Montgomery County, and Prince George's County: etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0236
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0703 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/06/2020
Legislative Date
9/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/06/2020 9/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 1:49 PM