Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Early Voting Centers - Sunday Voting
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Barve, Branch, Hixson, McIntosh, Summers, and Vallario
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the days on which each early voting center is required to be open before a primary or general election.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0200
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM