Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Research - Synthetic Cannabinoids
Sponsored by
Delegates Sophocleus, Burns, Dwyer, Eckardt, George, Kipke, McConkey, Minnick, Stocksdale, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified authorized provider to conduct research in the State with specified controlled dangerous substances not scheduled under federal law in specified circumstances; listing synthetic cannabinoids on Schedule I for purposes of designating controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0109
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0076 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-304, 5-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM