Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Arson, Burning, Malicious Destruction, and Theft - Property of Another - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson, Aumann, Buckel, Dumais, Folden, Hornberger, Kaiser, Kipke, Kittleman, Long, McComas, Metzgar, Morales, Szeliga, West, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining the term "property of another" as used in specified provisions prohibiting arson, burning, and the malicious destruction of property to conform with the definition found in provisions relating to theft and related crimes; clarifying that the "property of another" includes a tenant by the entirety; and generally relating to arson, burning, the malicious destruction of property, and theft.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {102919/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {102919/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-301, 7-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM