Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Carr, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Guyton, Hettleman, Kelly, R. Lewis, Love, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Terrasa, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 154
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the stakeholders required to be included in meetings convened under the Maternal Mortality Review Program to include families of women who have experienced near maternal death, a maternal death, or certain challenges during pregnancy or women who have experienced a near maternal death or certain other challenges during pregnancy; and requiring that, to the extent practicable, certain stakeholders convened under the Program reflect the racial and ethnic diversity of women most impacted by maternal deaths in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {546389/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 154
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {546389/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Finance 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 154
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Stakeholders
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page