Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer, Anderton, Aumann, Beidle, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Cassilly, Clark, Cluster, Ebersole, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Impallaria, Jacobs, Jones, Knotts, Lafferty, Lam, Long, McComas, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Otto, Robinson, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, West, Wivell, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, on or before December 31 each year, to submit a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on the procurement and implementation of the Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System, including information related to efforts to review and analyze the location of specified toll plazas for specified purposes.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0536
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0296 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670815/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicles Not Using Bridge - Toll Prohibition
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {670815/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:31 AM