Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, W. Miller, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in specified jurisdictions a nonrefillable container permit; authorizing a permit holder to sell draft beer for off-premises consumption by packaging the beer in a nonrefillable container that meets specified standards; specifying requirements for permit holders, hours of sale, and permit fees; and prohibiting permit fees to be charged for a nonrefillable container permit if the applicant has a refillable container permit.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0491
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123399/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {123399/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
(   10-102, 10-1101, 10-1103, 11-102, 11-1101, 11-1103.1, 12-102, 12-1101, 12-1102.1, 13-102, 13-1101, 13-1103, 14-102, 14-1101, 14-1103, 15-102, 15-1101, 15-1103, 16-102, 16-1101, 16-1103, 17-102, 17-1101, 17-1103, 18-102, 18-1101, 18-1103, 19-102, 19-1101, 19-1103, 20-102, 20-1101, 20-1106, 21-102, 21-1101, 21-1104.1, 22-102, 22-1101, 22-1104, 23-102, 23-1101, 23-1104, 25-102, 25-1101, 25-1104.1, 26-102, 26-1101, 26-1102.1, 27-102, 27-1101, 27-1103, 28-102, 28-1101, 28-1103, 31-102, 31-1101, 31-1102.1, 32-102, 32-1101, 32-1103, 33-102, 33-1101, 33-1104, 4-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page