Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers Operating
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Beidle, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Jackson, Jacobs, Knotts, McCray, O'Donnell, Otto, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a driver of a vehicle on a highway use the vehicle's tail lamps when the driver continuously operates the vehicle's windshield wipers due to impaired visibility resulting from unfavorable atmospheric conditions; and repealing the authority of a driver to use a vehicle's fog lights instead of the vehicle's headlamps during the continuous operation of the vehicle's windshield wipers under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0232
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-201.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM