Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Combined Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Acevero, B. Barnes, Boyce, Carr, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Feldmark, Healey, Ivey, Kerr, Korman, R. Lewis, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring affiliated corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a certain combined reporting method; requiring the Comptroller to report by March 1 of each year an estimate of the total additional tax revenue from corporations to be collected in the next fiscal year as a result of the combined reporting method; requiring the Comptroller to distribute certain revenue from corporations to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Combined Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Combined Reporting
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:26 AM