Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit – Wineries and Vineyards – Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barkley, Barve, Beidle, Brooks, Buckel, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, C. Howard, Kramer, Luedtke, Patterson, Reilly, Shoemaker, Turner, A. Washington, Afzali, D. Barnes, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jalisi, Kaiser, Long, Mosby, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the method by which an individual or a corporation may claim a credit against the State income tax for certain expenses related to certain wineries and vineyards in the State; extending for 3 years to June 30, 2021, a certain termination provision for an income tax credit for certain expenses made in connection with certain wineries and vineyards in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {835865/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {239634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {835865/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {239634/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 57
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit – Wineries and Vineyards – Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit – Wineries and Vineyards – Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-735 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM