Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Council of Montgomery County to enact a local law that grants to the Montgomery County Inspector General the same authority over Montgomery College as the Inspector General has over a department of county government.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page