Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Gaming - Home Games
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Afzali, Barve, Bobo, Boteler, Carr, Costa, DeBoy, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Guzzone, Ivey, Jones, Kipke, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Myers, Olszewski, Ready, S. Robinson, Stukes, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a person to conduct a home game that is a game of chance or skill involving wagering that is conducted in a person's home and allows a player to compete directly against one or more other players; prohibiting a person from conducting a home game involving a player's use of an electronic device that connects to the Internet; and prohibiting a person from benefiting financially in any way, directly or indirectly, other than from specified winnings.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0428
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0486 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2014 1/21/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/21/2014 Text - First - Criminal Law - Gaming - Home Games
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 13-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM