Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Limitation on Adoption of Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, S. Howard, Impallaria, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, O'Donnell, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a unit authorized by law to adopt regulations from adopting proposed regulations during the period beginning the day after a statewide general election for Governor and ending the day when the succeeding Governor takes office if the Governor serving in office on the day of the general election is not a candidate for the office or is defeated in the general election.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM