Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission from entering into a contract unless the contract contains a certain nondiscrimination provision; requiring the Commission to provide a contractor a reasonable opportunity to cure a certain defect in a contract or subcontract; authorizing the Commission to void a contract if a contractor fails to cure a certain defect; establishing that a contractor is entitled to the reasonable value of certain work and materials under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Finance 40
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text - Chapter - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited in Contracts MC/PG 107-19
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-402.1, 20-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM