Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the areas in which the Neighborhood Business Development Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development is authorized to provide financial assistance; authorizing the Maryland Housing Fund and the Community Development Administration in the Department to provide financial assistance to specified business projects; requiring the Department to reserve a specified amount of money to make financial assistance available to specified projects located in sustainable communities; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700319/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {700319/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201, 3-202, 3-206, 4-201, 4-211, 4-223, 4-225, 4-234, 6-102, 6-206, 6-301, 6-302, 6-303, 6-304, 6-305, 6-308, 6-308.1, 6-310, 6-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM