Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Zucker, Barkley, Barnes, Braveboy, Cullison, Frush, Gaines, A. Kelly, Love, Luedtke, A. Miller, Rosenberg, Summers, Hammen, and Pendergrass
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell essential goods and services during a state of emergency for a price of more than 20% above the price charged by that person for those goods and services not more than 60 days or less than 4 days before the state of emergency; creating specified exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393196/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-44)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2013 2/19/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {393196/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Finance 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-1101 through 14-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM