Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Bagnall, Barron, Brooks, Carr, Charkoudian, Crosby, Cullison, D.E. Davis, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Holmes, Ivey, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Qi, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Washington, and Williams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "mortgage lender" to mean a person that is duly licensed under certain provisions of the Financial Institutions Article; clarifying the definition of "consumer claim"; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that the Act be construed as clarifying the Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act and that, with regard to sales of real property to bona fide purchasers, the Act applies only to sales made on or after June 1, 2020.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0262
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0485 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page