Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limit in Business and Residential Districts MC 22-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, in Montgomery County, the maximum authorized speed limit on all highways in a business district and undivided highways in a residential district from 30 miles an hour to between 20 and 30 miles an hour; and exempting the local authority in Montgomery County from the requirement to conduct an engineering and traffic investigation when conforming maximum speed limits to the maximum speed limit established under the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limit in Business and Residential Districts MC 22-17
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-801.1, 21-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM