Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's or Renter's Insurance and Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Bundling Requirement - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Barkley, Love, Olszewski, and Vaughn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance or renter's insurance, from denying, refusing to renew, or canceling coverage solely because the applicant or policyholder does not carry private passenger motor vehicle insurance with specified insurers; prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from taking specified actions solely because the applicant or policyholder does not carry homeowner's insurance or renter's insurance with specified insurers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0446
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1105 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723896/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337173/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {723896/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Finance 31
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {337173/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 63
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM