Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Arikan, Buckel, Cassilly, Hornberger, Kipke, Mangione, Parrott, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that personal protection or self-defense can qualify as a good and substantial reason to wear, carry, or transport a handgun for purposes of the issuance by the Secretary of State Police of a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that an amount representing the increase in General Fund revenues, less increased administrative costs, realized from the increased number of permits issued under the Act be included in the annual budget to fund certain school mental health programs.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0647 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM