Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Pena-Melnyk, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Campos, Carr, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Hayes, Healey, Holmes, Hornberger, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, McMillan, Metzgar, A. Miller, W. Miller, B. Robinson, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Walker, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified public agencies to bear a specified burden of proof in due process hearings that are held to resolve a dispute relating to the provision of a free appropriate public education; providing a specified exception for a parent or guardian seeking tuition reimbursement for a unilateral placement; and establishing that a specified provision of law is not intended to change specified record-keeping requirements or what constitutes a free appropriate public education under federal or State law.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM